+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 30, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/26
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/26
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
- Received from House
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:00
On January 6, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsor
Government and Veterans Affairs
Type:
Primary Sponsor