+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (5)
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 54
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:45
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee