+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/08
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/08
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee