+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/14
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/13
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Sent to Governor
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 2
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 1 1
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 5
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:30
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 3 1
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee