+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/21
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/20
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 0
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 15, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On January 14, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 11, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor