+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/29
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/28
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0, Emergency clause carried
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
- Committee Hearing 10:30
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On January 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 1, Emergency clause carried
On January 8, 2019 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 7, 2019 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 4, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On January 3, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee