+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On March 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On February 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 17, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 1
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Management
Type:
Primary Sponsor