+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/10
On March 10, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/09
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2021 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On January 8, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
On January 6, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 02:00
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Management
Type:
Primary Sponsor