+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
On April 21, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/19
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Laid over one legislative day
On March 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:15
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
On January 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 13, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
On January 12, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 1
On January 10, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Management
Type:
Primary Sponsor