+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
On March 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 17, 2021 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 18 2 1
On January 12, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
On January 11, 2021 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Reported back, do pass 14 0 0
On January 7, 2021 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 01:30
On January 5, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Management
Type:
Primary Sponsor