+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 03/28
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 03/28
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
On January 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2
On January 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee
+ − Sponsor
Legislative Management
Type:
Primary Sponsor