+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/11
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/08
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On March 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1
On March 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 03:30
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
On February 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 23, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 3
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 20 0 1
On January 12, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On January 4, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor