+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/30
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/30
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
- Signed by Speaker
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 17, Emergency clause carried
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
- Conference committee report adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 44 nays 0
- Emergency clause carried
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Carlisle Bowman Robinson
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Conference committee appointed Sanford Brandenburg Guggisberg
- Refused to concur
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment proposed on floor
- Amendment adopted
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Emergency clause carried
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 08:30
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
- Received from House
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 17
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 7 0
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Rereferred to Appropriations
- Reconsidered
- Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 59
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 17 4 1
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:00
On January 16, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 11:00
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor