+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Governor 04/29
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to Governor
On April 26, 2013 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
- Conference committee report adopted
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee appointed Carlisle Krebsbach Warner
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Refused to concur
- Conference committee appointed Grande Martinson Williams
On March 25, 2013 in the House:
- Returned to House (12)
On March 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Hearing 10:00
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received from House
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment adopted, placed on calendar
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 21 0 1
On January 11, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Hearing 09:30
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
+ − Sponsor
Appropriations
Type:
Primary Sponsor