+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ch. Res 2019-11
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 3, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Cal Pursuant 32
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2019
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
- Passed 1st Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 6
May 31, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor