+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-19
- Signed by Gov. 4/3/2013
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 04/01/2013
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/27/2013
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 03/26/2013
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 03/20/2013
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (4)
March 27, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 20, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 117
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
March 5, 2013: THIRD READING
- Yeas: 50
March 4, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 45
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor