+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2016-70
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 90-471 -
+ − Votes (4)
July 1, 2016: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 43
- Absent: 7
June 30, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
June 30, 2016: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 30, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor