+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2016-39
- Ratified
On June 23, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/23/2016
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 13, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Local Government
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
June 23, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Absent: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor