+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2014-47
- Pres. To Gov. 06/30/2014
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 30, 2014 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2014
On June 26, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Reptd Fav
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Reptd Fav
On June 18, 2014 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 17, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On June 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/12/2014
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/16/2014
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 3
June 30, 2014: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 26, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
June 16, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 12, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor