+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (18)
+ − Actions (41)
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Became Law W/o Signature
- Ch. SL 2019-202
On August 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 8/15/2019
On August 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred In H Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On August 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On August 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Amend Tabled A2
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On August 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 08/07/2019
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
- Serial Referral To Insurance Stricken
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House, if favorable, Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amend Tabled A1
- Amend Tabled A2
- Amend Tabled A3
- Passed 2nd Reading
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Health Care
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Votes (2)
August 13, 2019: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 9
August 7, 2019: Second Reading M8 Re-Refer Insurance
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 64
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor