+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2016-121
- Signed by Gov. 7/28/2016
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed on Today's Calendar
On July 1, 2016 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Report Adopted
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 7/1/2016
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 05/31/2016
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 23, 2016 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Health
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Health Care
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 108A-54 -
- 143B-139.6C -
- 143B-216.80 -
- 108A -
- 143B -
+ − Votes (5)
July 1, 2016: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 10
- Absent: 14
July 1, 2016: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 8
May 31, 2016: Motion 9 To Concur
- Nays: 48
- Absent: 2
May 25, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 6
May 18, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2