+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2016-96
- Signed by Gov. 7/18/2016
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 07/01/2016
- Ratified
On June 30, 2016 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 29, 2016 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 27, 2016 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Regular Message Received From Senate
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Information Technology
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
June 30, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
May 26, 2016: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor