+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (44)
On July 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/12/2017
- Ch. SL 2017-104
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Com Reported
On June 30, 2017 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
- Conf Com Appointed
On March 30, 2017 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Finance
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 03/15/2017
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 03/14/2017
- Reptd Fav
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Finance
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 30, 2017: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 105
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 11
June 30, 2017: For Adoption Conference Report
- Yeas: 41
- Absent: 9
June 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 109
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 9
June 29, 2017: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
March 15, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor