+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2020-34
On June 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Concurred In H Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 18, 2020 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/18/2020
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 2, 2020 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
June 23, 2020: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor