+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 8/6/2014
- Ch. SL 2014-107
On July 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 07/31/2014
On July 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On July 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On July 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/29/2014
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On July 25, 2014 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 24, 2014 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On July 2, 2014 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Special Message Received From Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Judiciary I
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
+ − Votes (6)
July 29, 2014: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
July 25, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 16
July 1, 2014: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
July 1, 2014: Third Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 30, 2014: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 30, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor