+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 6/20/2018
- Ch. SL 2018-16
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2018
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 11, 2018 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/12/2018
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From Senate
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
On June 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (4)
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 6, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3