+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (40)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2020-73
- Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/25/2020
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 24, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/24/2020
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 22, 2020 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From Senate
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
- Sequential Referral To Appropriations/Base Budget Added
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Transportation
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2020: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 24, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor