+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (35)
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 15, 2018 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A6
- Amend Adopted A5
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A2
On June 14, 2018 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Added to Calendar
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 06/15/2018
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From Senate
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Statutes Amended (98)
- 93B -
- 143B -
- 143B-426.39 -
- 93B-1 -
- 93B-2 -
- 93B-2.1 -
- 93B-4 -
- 115C -
- 116 -
- 90 -
- 90C -
- 95 -
- 97 -
- 115C-218.80 -
- 115C-270.20 -
- 115C-270.21 -
- 115C-47 -
- 116-235 -
- 116-69.1 -
- 143B-68 -
- 150B-2 -
- 150B-21.20 -
- 150B-21.3A -
- 150B-21.5 -
- 150B-21.7 -
- 150B-22 -
- 150B-3 -
- 150B-43 -
- 150B-45 -
- 86B-1 -
- 86B-10 -
- 86B-11 -
- 86B-12 -
- 86B-13 -
- 86B-14 -
- 86B-15 -
- 86B-16 -
- 86B-17 -
- 86B-18 -
- 86B-19 -
- 86B-2 -
- 86B-20 -
- 86B-21 -
- 86B-22 -
- 86B-23 -
- 86B-24 -
- 86B-25 -
- 86B-26 -
- 86B-27 -
- 86B-28 -
- 86B-29 -
- 86B-3 -
- 86B-30 -
- 86B-31 -
- 86B-4 -
- 86B-5 -
- 86B-6 -
- 86B-7 -
- 86B-8 -
- 86B-9 -
- 88B-6 -
- 90-202.10 -
- 90-270.14A -
- 90-270.15 -
- 90-270.18 -
- 90-270.22 -
- 90-389 -
- 90-625 -
- 90C-1 -
- 90C-20 -
- 90C-21 -
- 90C-22 -
- 90C-23 -
- 90C-24 -
- 90C-25 -
- 90C-26 -
- 90C-27 -
- 90C-28 -
- 90C-29 -
- 90C-30 -
- 90C-31 -
- 90C-32 -
- 90C-33 -
- 90C-34 -
- 90C-35 -
- 90C-36 -
- 90C-37 -
- 93B-17 -
- 93B-18 -
- 93B-19 -
- 93B-20 -
- 93B-21 -
- 93B-22 -
- 93B-5 -
- 95-25.14 -
- 95-25.2 -
- 95-25.24B -
- 97-13 -
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2018: A6 Horn Second Reading
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 21
June 15, 2018: Second Reading
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 21
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor