+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 24, 2014 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Finance Added
On May 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On State and Local Government
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor