+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (25)
On June 4, 2020 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amendment Withdrawn A1
- Amend Recon A1
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reconsidered 2nd Reading
On June 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Commerce and Insurance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2020: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
June 2, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Bryan
Type:
Primary Sponsor