+ − Summaries (93)
+ − Full Texts (20)
+ − Actions (36)
On May 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2020-3
- Signed by Gov. 5/4/2020
On May 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/2/2020
- Ratified
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav To Concur
- Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On May 2, 2020 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A7
On April 29, 2020 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From Senate
On April 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amendment Withdrawn A2
- Amend Adopted A6
- Amend Adopted A5
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A1
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Present/NV: 1
May 2, 2020: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsors (46)
Type:
Primary Sponsor