+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2015-104
- Signed by Gov. 6/24/2015
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/16/2015
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/11/2015
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 10, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 8, 2015 in the House:
- Postponed To 06/09/2015
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/08/2015
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 27, 2015 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Commerce
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Commerce
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2015: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 9, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 5
April 16, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 44
- Absent: 6
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor