+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (20)
On July 16, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Ch. SL 2019-122
On July 15, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From Senate
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 07/15/2019
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
July 16, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 37
- Absent: 4
July 15, 2019: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor