+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (33)
+ − Actions (56)
On November 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-239
- Signed by Gov. 11/6/2019
On October 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 10/31/2019
On October 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On October 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
On October 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 10/29/2019
- Conf Com Reported
On October 28, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 10/29/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 44(d)
- Conf Com Reported
On October 3, 2019 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On October 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On September 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 09/11/2019
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 28, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A7
- Amend Adopted A6
- Amend Failed A5
On August 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On August 27, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Failed A3
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On August 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/27/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Elections and Ethics Law, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
- Special Message Received From Senate
On July 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Tabled A5
- Amend Adopted A4
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/08/2019
- Reptd Fav
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (12)
+ − Votes (2)
October 29, 2019: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 111
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
October 29, 2019: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 49
- Absent: 1