+ − Summaries (61)
+ − Full Texts (21)
+ − Actions (51)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/1/2020
- Ch. SL 2020-78
On June 26, 2020 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted
On June 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Report Adopted
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2020
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2020
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Added to Calendar
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Changed
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Conferees Reappointed
- Conf Com Dismissed
On June 25, 2020 in the House:
- Conferees Reappointed
- Conf Com Dismissed
On October 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Dismissed
- Conferees Reappointed
On August 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conferees Changed
On August 20, 2019 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On August 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On August 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On August 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On August 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On August 7, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On August 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
On August 5, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 08/06/2019
On July 31, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Ruled Material
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 4, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
On July 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2020: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 87
- Nays: 21
- Absent: 12
June 26, 2020: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor