+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 6/21/2019
- Ch. SL 2019-37
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/14/2019
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 06/12/2019
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Serial Referral To Environment Stricken
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 30, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 7, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3