+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2014-79
- Signed by Gov. 7/22/2014
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Report Adopted
- Added to Calendar
On July 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Conf Report Adopted
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 07/16/2014
On July 3, 2014 in the House:
- Respond to Senate Fail to Concur - Appoint Conferees Message Sent To Senate
On July 2, 2014 in the House:
- Conf Com Appointed
On July 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On July 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 07/01/2014
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 25, 2014 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Special Message Sent To Senate
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 12, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development
- Reptd Fav
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Judiciary Subcommittee A, if favorable, Commerce and Job Development
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 16, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Engrossed
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Insurance
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (16)
- 58 -
- 58-36-105 -
- 97-19.1 -
- 97-36 -
- 127C -
- 132 -
- 143 -
- 127C-1 -
- 127C-5 -
- 132-1.2 -
- 143-135.29 -
- 143-138 -
- 143-151.71 -
- 143-151.73 -
- 143-151.75 -
- 143-318.11 -
+ − Votes (6)
July 16, 2014: C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 106
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 12
July 16, 2014: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
July 1, 2014: Motion 9 To Concur
- Nays: 49
- Absent: 1
June 25, 2014: Second Reading
- Yeas: 113
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 6
May 15, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
May 15, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor