+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Special Message Sent To House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Vote
May 8, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 18
- Absent: 5
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor