+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On August 17, 2015 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref to the Com on Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On August 13, 2015 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On August 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On August 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
On August 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Tabled A4
- Amend Adopted A3
- Amend Adopted A2
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Engrossed
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 08/11/2015
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On August 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statute Amended
- C-II-23 -
+ − Votes (6)
August 12, 2015: Third Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 5
August 11, 2015: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 4
August 11, 2015: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
August 11, 2015: Amendment 4 Motion 1 To Table
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 4
August 11, 2015: Second Reading
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 5
August 10, 2015: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 15
- Absent: 2