+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 5/16/2019
- Ch. SL 2019-15
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 5/15/2019
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
On May 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On May 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Re-ref Com On Appropriations, Transportation
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 05/15/2019
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 05/07/2019
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Cal
- Placed On Cal For 04/29/2019
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
May 15, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 99
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 20
April 29, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2