+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019
- Ch. SL 2019-170
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2019
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred In H Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
July 15, 2019: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
July 9, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 112
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor