+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (12)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by Gov. 6/30/2020
- Ch. SL 2020-50
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/22/2020
On June 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Concurred In H Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
- Placed On Cal For 06/18/2020
On June 16, 2020 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
On June 15, 2020 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/16/2020
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2020: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
May 7, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor