+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (14)
+ − Actions (59)
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2020-35
- Signed by Gov. 6/25/2020
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/18/2020
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H Com Sub
On June 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/16/2020
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 11, 2020 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On June 10, 2020 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 9, 2020 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/10/2020
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
On August 29, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 26, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 20, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 14, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On August 5, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Withdrawn From Com
On July 24, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 22, 2019 in the House:
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Special Message Received From Senate
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2020: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 10, 2020: Second Reading
- Yeas: 119
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor