+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (38)
On July 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-72
- Signed by Gov. 7/1/2019
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 6/26/2019
- Ratified
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On June 24, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/25/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 19, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav
On June 4, 2019 in the House:
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Added
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken
- Reptd Fav
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Reptd Fav
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Added
- Sequential Referral To Finance Added
- Sequential Referral To Rules and Operations of the Senate Stricken
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
June 25, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 108
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 7
April 18, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 14
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor