+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2017-151
- Signed by Gov. 7/20/2017
On June 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 6/30/2017
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Special Message Sent To Senate
On June 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Special Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On June 29, 2017 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 27, 2017 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Special Message Received From Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Special Message Sent To House
On June 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Engrossed
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
- Placed On Cal For 06/26/2017
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Withdrawn From Com
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed 1st Reading
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Statutes Amended (40)
- 14 -
- 18B -
- 19 -
- 90 -
- 131E -
- 143B -
- 131E-84.1 -
- 14-202.13 -
- 14-43.11 -
- 143B-348 -
- 143B-431.3 -
- 18B-1003 -
- 19-8.4 -
- 90-621 -
- 90-622 -
- 90-623 -
- 90-624 -
- 90-626 -
- 90-628 -
- 90-629 -
- 90-629.1 -
- 90-630.1 -
- 90-630.5 -
- 90-632 -
- 90-632.10 -
- 90-632.11 -
- 90-632.12 -
- 90-632.13 -
- 90-632.14 -
- 90-632.15 -
- 90-632.16 -
- 90-632.17 -
- 90-632.18 -
- 90-634 -
- 14-202.10 -
- 14-202.11 -
- 143B-919 -
- 105-41 -
- 90-632.19 -
- 105 -
+ − Votes (6)
June 29, 2017: A1 McNeill M4 Previous Question Second Reading
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 32
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
June 29, 2017: A1 McNeill Second Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 41
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
June 29, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 106
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 8
June 29, 2017: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 9
June 26, 2017: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
June 26, 2017: Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3