+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 6, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Environment
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 74 -
- 113 -
- 143 -
- 143B -
- 159I -
- 113-175.6 -
- 113-182.1 -
- 143-215.108 -
- 143-215.3A -
- 143B-279.15 -
- 143B-289.44 -
- 143B-344.38 -
- 159I-29 -
- 74-54.1 -
+ − Vote
May 1, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2