+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2019-168
- Signed by Gov. 7/26/2019
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2019
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On July 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H Com Sub
On July 11, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Sent To Senate
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Received For Concurrence in H Com Sub
On July 10, 2019 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On July 9, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/10/2019
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 8, 2019 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/09/2019
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav
On June 27, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 17, 2019 in the House:
- Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Regular Message Sent To House
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Regular Message Received From Senate
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Passed 2nd Reading
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reptd Fav
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Withdrawn From Com
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
- Passed 1st Reading
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Votes (2)
July 15, 2019: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 45
- Absent: 5
July 10, 2019: Second Reading
- Yeas: 116
- Absent: 4