+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-162
- Signed by Gov. 6/19/2013
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 06/12/2013
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ratified
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
On June 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed On Cal For 06/10/2013
- Rec To Concur H Com Sub
On June 5, 2013 in the House:
- Ordered Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
On June 4, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 3, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Banking
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Failed A8
- Amend Failed A7
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A6
- Amend Adopted A5
- Amend Failed A4
- Amend Failed A3
- Amend Adopted A2
- Amend Adopted A1
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref To Com On Commerce
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (9)
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
+ − Votes (14)
June 10, 2013: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
June 5, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 69
- Nays: 44
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 4
June 4, 2013: A1 Stam Second Reading
- Yeas: 114
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
June 4, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 74
- Nays: 42
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 3
May 6, 2013: Amendment 8
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
May 6, 2013: Amendment 7
- Yeas: 15
- Nays: 33
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2013: Amendment 5
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Amendment 6
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 9
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Amendment 2
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Amendment 3
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 34
- Absent: 2
May 2, 2013: Amendment 4
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 39
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor