+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (44)
On August 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-394
- Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013
On July 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pres. To Gov. 07/29/2013
- Ratified
On July 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered Enrolled
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted 3rd
On July 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted 3rd
On July 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Report Adopted 2nd
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Report Adopted 2nd
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Appointed
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec To Concur H Com Sub
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Failed Concur In H Com Sub
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Conf Com Reported
- Conf Com Appointed
On July 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conf Com Reported
- Placed On Cal For 07/24/2013
On July 23, 2013 in the House:
- Ruled Material
- Placed On Cal For 07/24/2013
On July 22, 2013 in the House:
- Postponed To 07/23/2013
On July 18, 2013 in the House:
- Amend Adopted A1
- Ordered Engrossed
- Placed On Cal For 07/22/2013
On July 17, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Postponed To 07/18/2013
On July 16, 2013 in the House:
- Placed On Cal For 07/17/2013
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On July 8, 2013 in the House:
- Ref To Com On Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On July 3, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Passed 3rd Reading
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Withdrawn From Com
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (6)
+ − Votes (11)
July 25, 2013: R3 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 102
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
July 25, 2013: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 4
- Absent: 5
July 24, 2013: R2 Ruled Mat'l C RPT Adoption
- Yeas: 93
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
July 24, 2013: Conference Rpt Motion 8 To Adopt Second Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
July 23, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 110
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
July 23, 2013: Motion 9 To Concur Second Reading
- Nays: 47
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 2
July 18, 2013: A1 Daughtry Third Reading
- Yeas: 107
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 10
July 17, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 6
July 2, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Absent: 3
July 1, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
July 1, 2013: Amendment 1
- Yeas: 46
- Absent: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor