+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (36)
On August 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ch. SL 2013-393
- Signed by Gov. 8/23/2013
On July 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rec To Concur H Com Sub
On July 26, 2013 in the House:
- Added to Calendar
- Passed 3rd Reading
- Amend Adopted A1
On July 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Today's Calendar
- Concurred In H/Com Sub
- Ordered Enrolled
- Ratified
- Pres. To Gov. 07/29/2013
On July 25, 2013 in the House:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Added to Calendar
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Reptd Fav Com Sub 2
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Cal
On July 24, 2013 in the House:
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
- Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
- Placed On Cal For 07/25/2013
On July 22, 2013 in the House:
- Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
- Withdrawn From Com
- Serial Referral To Finance Stricken
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Ref to the Com on Health and Human Services, if favorable, Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- Rec From Senate
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed 2nd Reading
- Passed 3rd Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-ref Com On Finance
- Com Substitute Adopted
- Reptd Fav Com Substitute
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Finance
- Passed 1st Reading
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Filed
+ − Amendment
+ − Statutes Amended (27)
- 1 -
- 131E -
- 1-72.2 -
- 105A-2 -
- 108A-121 -
- 108A-122 -
- 108A-123 -
- 108A-124 -
- 108A-126 -
- 131E-147.1 -
- 131E-153 -
- 131E-153.1 -
- 131E-153.2 -
- 131E-153.3 -
- 131E-214.5 -
- 131E-214.6 -
- 131E-214.7 -
- 131E-273 -
- 131E-91 -
- 131E-91.1 -
- 131E-91.2 -
- 131E-91.3 -
- 131E-97.3 -
- 131E-99 -
- 58-3-245 -
- 90-413.2 -
- 90-413.9 -
+ − Votes (5)
July 26, 2013: A1 Stam Third Reading
- Yeas: 105
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 11
July 26, 2013: Third Reading
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 36
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 11
July 26, 2013: Motion 9 To Concur
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 9
July 25, 2013: Second Reading
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 38
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 10
May 9, 2013: SECOND READING
- Yeas: 48
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor